New Hampshire
Strafford
Rochester
(SB) Savings banks, state charter
inactive
6250
1846
FDIC Certificate Number: 6250
FDIC's unique number: 4219
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 594901
Report Date: 1990-12-31
Bank Charter Class: SB
The date of the last data update: 1991-02-08
1846-01-01 Institution established. Original name: First Somersworth-rollinsford National Bank.
1970-02-18 Changed name to Granite State National Bank .
1988-08-01 Reorganized.
1988-08-01 Changed name to First Nh Banks Granite State .
1991-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First NH Bank in Concord, New Hampshire.
1991-03-29 Acquired City Bank And Trust in Claremont, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Acquired Nashua Trust Company in Nashua, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Acquired Bankeast in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Acquired Amoskeag Bank in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Acquired Bank Meridian, National Association in Hampton, New Hampshire.
1992-05-01 Reorganized.
1992-06-01 Acquired First Nh Bank, National Association in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1992-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from Concord, New Hampshire to Manchester, New Hampshire.
1995-03-30 Acquired Southeast Bank For Savings in Dover, New Hampshire.
1996-09-01 Changed name to Citizens Bank New Hampshire .
1996-09-01 Acquired First New Hampshire Investment Services in Manchester, New Hampshire.
2007-09-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of RBS Citizens, National Association in Providence, Rhode Island.
Total assets: $133,141,000
Total deposits: $121,415,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First NH Banks Granite State does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First NH Banks Granite State, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First NH Banks Granite State will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-648