New Hampshire – Rockingham – Seabrook
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
www.firstandocean.com
New Hampshire
Rockingham
Seabrook
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
2623
1865
FDIC Certificate Number: 2623
FDIC's unique number: 1701
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 273907
Report Date: 2003-09-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 1011
The date of the last data update: 2004-01-22
1865-01-01 Institution established. Original name: First And Ocean National Bank Of Newburyport.
1993-01-01 Changed name to First & Ocean National Bank .
1997-05-05 Moved bank headquarters from Newburyport, Massachusetts to Seabrook, New Hampshire.
2003-12-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of BankNorth, National Association in Portland, Maine.
2004-04-30 Acquired Cape Cod Bank And Trust, National Association in Hyannis, Massachusetts.
2004-04-30 Acquired Foxborough Savings Bank in Foxboro, Massachusetts.
2005-01-21 Acquired Boston Federal Savings Bank in Burlington, Massachusetts.
2005-05-23 Changed name to Td Banknorth, National Association .
2006-01-31 Acquired Hudson United Bank in Mahwah, New Jersey.
2007-01-01 Acquired Interchange Bank in Saddle Brook, New Jersey.
2008-05-31 Changed name to Td Bank, National Association .
2008-05-31 Moved bank headquarters from Portland, Maine to Wilmington, Delaware.
2008-05-31 Acquired Commerce Bank, National Association in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
2008-05-31 Acquired Commerce Bank/north in Ramsey, New Jersey.
2010-04-16 Acquired Riverside National Bank Of Florida in Fort Pierce, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-04-16 Acquired First Federal Bank Of North Florida in Palatka, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-04-16 Acquired Americanfirst Bank in Clermont, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-09-30 Acquired Carolina First Bank in Greenville, South Carolina.
Total assets: $271,655,000
Total deposits: $229,934,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First & Ocean National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First & Ocean National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First & Ocean National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-13040