Delaware – New Castle – Newark
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Delaware
New Castle
Newark
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
26723
1986
FDIC Certificate Number: 26723
FDIC's unique number: 35804
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Claymont
Federal Reserve ID Number: 67115
Report Date: 1988-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1986-07-24 Institution established. Original name: Republicbank Delaware.
1988-05-02 Acquired Interfirst Bank Delaware in Newark, Delaware.
1988-05-02 Changed name to First Republicbank Delaware .
1988-08-02 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Delaware Bridge Bank, National Association in Newark, Delaware.
1988-10-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Citibank in New Castle, Delaware.
2006-10-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Citibank, National Association in Las Vegas, Nevada.
2008-11-23 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2011-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from Las Vegas, Nevada to Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2011-07-01 Acquired Citibank , N.A. in Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
Total assets: $582,350,000
Total deposits: $164,867,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First RepublicBank Delaware does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First RepublicBank Delaware, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First RepublicBank Delaware will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-1948