Texas – Henderson – Athens
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
Texas
Henderson
Athens
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
31434
1963
FDIC Certificate Number: 31434
FDIC's unique number: 44268
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Dallas
Federal Reserve ID Number: 74672
Report Date: 1982-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1998-07-17
1963-01-01 Institution established. Original name: First Savings And Loan Association Of Athens.
1982-05-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Investex Savings Association in Tyler, Texas.
1987-05-29 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Independent American Savings and Loan Association in Irving, Texas.
1987-05-31 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Independent American Savings and Loan Association FSA in Irving, Texas.
1988-08-31 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Sunbelt Savings FSB in Dallas, Texas.
1989-07-31 Moved bank headquarters from Irving, Texas to Dallas, Texas.
1990-01-29 Changed name to Sunbelt Savings, Fsb .
1990-01-29 Moved bank headquarters from Dallas, Texas to Irving, Texas.
1990-06-15 Acquired Gill Savings Association in Hondo, Texas.
1990-06-15 Acquired Bexar Savings Association in San Antonio, Texas.
1991-04-26 Failed, went into receivership, and then became Sunbelt Federal Savings, FSB in Irving, Texas.
1992-04-10 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Bank of America Texas, National Association in Houston, Texas.
1992-12-31 Acquired Sequor National Bank Texas in Dallas, Texas.
1993-02-01 Moved bank headquarters from Houston, Texas to Irving, Texas.
1999-04-08 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of NationsBank, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1999-07-05 Changed name to Bank Of America, National Association .
1999-07-23 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of America, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1999-12-01 Acquired Bank Of America Utah, National Association in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2001-05-31 Acquired Nationsbank Trust Company Of New York in New York, New York.
2005-06-13 Acquired Fleet National Bank in Providence, Rhode Island.
2006-09-22 Acquired Mbna America Delaware, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.
2008-02-22 Acquired United States Trust Company , National Association in New York, New York.
2008-06-30 Acquired Bank Of America Georgia, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank Midwest National Association in Troy, Michigan.
2009-01-16 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2009-04-27 Acquired Countrywide Bank, Fsb in Centennial, Colorado.
2009-07-01 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank Usa in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2009-11-02 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank & Trust Co., Fsb in New York, New York.
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First Savings and Loan Association of Athens does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First Savings and Loan Association of Athens, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Savings and Loan Association of Athens will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-6662