New Hampshire – Rockingham – Exeter
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
New Hampshire
Rockingham
Exeter
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
30646
1892
FDIC Certificate Number: 30646
FDIC's unique number: 43480
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 542470
Report Date: 1995-09-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1996-01-31
1892-01-01 Institution established. Original name: First Savings And Loan Association Of New Hampshire.
1982-02-28 Acquired Franklin Co-operative Bank in Franklin, New Hampshire.
1987-09-30 Changed organization type to Stock Savings & Loan.
1989-06-30 Moved bank headquarters from Exeter Town, New Hampshire to Exeter, New Hampshire.
1991-10-11 Acquired Iona Savings Bank in Tilton, New Hampshire.
1992-08-28 Acquired Seacoast Savings Bank in Dover, New Hampshire.
1995-10-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Vermont Federal Bank, FSB in Williston, Vermont.
1997-09-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Vermont National Bank in Brattleboro, Vermont.
1997-09-22 Changed name to Vermont Federal National Bank .
1997-09-22 Changed organization type to Commercial Bank.
1997-09-22 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.
2000-03-24 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Chittenden Trust Company in Burlington, Vermont.
2008-01-01 Changed institution class to Occ Supervised Savings Banks.
2008-01-01 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
2008-01-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Office Of Thrift Supervision.
2009-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of People's United Bank in Bridgeport, Connecticut.
2010-04-16 Acquired Butler Bank in Lowell, Massachusetts as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-11-30 Acquired Bank Of Smithtown in Smithtown, New York.
2010-11-30 Acquired Riverbank in North Andover, Massachusetts.
2011-07-01 Acquired Danversbank in Danvers, Massachusetts.
Total assets: $276,996,000
Total deposits: $221,450,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First Savings and Loan Association of New Hampshire does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First Savings and Loan Association of New Hampshire, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Savings and Loan Association of New Hampshire will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-27564