Ohio – Stark – Massillon
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
Ohio
Stark
Massillon
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
33033
1990
FDIC Certificate Number: 33033
FDIC's unique number: 46263
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Columbus
Federal Reserve ID Number: 246974
Report Date: 1991-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1994-08-02
1990-04-20 Institution established. Original name: First Savings And Loan Company, F.A.
1990-04-20 Acquired First Savings And Loan Company in Massillon, Ohio.
1991-07-19 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of The United National Bank & Trust Company in Canton, Ohio.
2002-03-07 Changed name to Unizan Bank, National Association .
2002-03-07 Acquired The First National Bank Of Zanesville in Zanesville, Ohio.
2006-03-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Huntington National Bank in Columbus, Ohio.
2007-08-31 Acquired Sky Trust, National Association in Pepper Pike, Ohio.
2007-09-21 Acquired Sky Bank in Salineville, Ohio.
2009-10-02 Acquired Warren Bank in Warren, Michigan as part of a government assisted transaction.
Total assets: $107,407,000
Total deposits: $110,078,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First Savings and Loan Company, F.A. does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First Savings and Loan Company, F.A., we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Savings and Loan Company, F.A. will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-5980