Texas – Webb – Laredo
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
Texas
Webb
Laredo
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
32793
1989
FDIC Certificate Number: 32793
FDIC's unique number: 45704
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Houston
Federal Reserve ID Number: 49979
Report Date: 1990-03-31
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1995-02-06
1989-09-14 Institution established. Original name: First Savings Of Laredo, FA.
1989-09-14 Acquired First Federal Savings And Loan Association in Laredo, Texas.
1990-06-15 Government conservatorship or bridge bank resolved.
1990-06-15 Ceased operations as a result of a government supervised payoff, liquidation or closing. No active institution received any of deposits.
Total assets: $142,609,000
Total deposits: $143,693,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First Savings of Laredo, FA does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First Savings of Laredo, FA, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Savings of Laredo, FA will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-5227