Iowa – Floyd – Charles City
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.1stsecuritybank.com
Iowa
Floyd
Charles City
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
1852
1903
FDIC Certificate Number: 1852
FDIC's unique number: 1233
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Des Moines
Federal Reserve ID Number: 894544
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 14
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2009-11-23
1903-07-14 Institution established. Original name: First Security Bank & Trust Company.
1971-01-01 Changed name to First Security Bank And Trust Company .
1987-03-04 Acquired The First State Bank in Rockford, Iowa.
1988-01-20 Acquired Aredale State Bank in Aredale, Iowa.
2009-11-07 Acquired First State Bank in Riceville, Iowa.
2009-11-07 Acquired First State Bank in Nora Springs, Iowa.
Total assets: $428,210,000
Total deposits: $342,698,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $342,698,000
Equity capital: $45,504,000
Net income: $2,763,000
Return on Assets: 1.29
Return on Equity: 12.72
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Cedar Valley Bankshares, Ltd.
First Security Bank And Trust Company - Aredale Branch
First Security Bank And Trust Company - Dumont Branch
First Security Bank And Trust Company - First Security Bank And
First Security Bank And Trust Company - Ionia Branch
First Security Bank And Trust Company - Manly Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
First Security Bank and Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First Security Bank and Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Security Bank and Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-2314