Colorado – Moffat – Craig
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
Colorado
Moffat
Craig
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
27439
1988
FDIC Certificate Number: 27439
FDIC's unique number: 39932
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Denver
Federal Reserve ID Number: 1359200
Report Date: 1998-09-30
Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 1998-12-03
1988-09-21 Institution established. Original name: First Security Bank Of Craig.
1988-09-21 Acquired Central Bank Of Craig, National Association in Craig, Colorado.
1998-11-16 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Imperial Bank in Inglewood, California.
1998-12-01 Acquired Imperial Bank Arizona in Sun City, Arizona.
1999-10-20 Acquired Imperial Mutual Savings Bank in Kirkland, Washington.
2001-09-29 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Comerica Bank-California in San Jose, California.
2003-06-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Comerica Bank in Detroit, Michigan.
2007-11-01 Moved bank headquarters from San Jose, California to Dallas, Texas.
2007-11-01 Reorganized.
2011-07-28 Acquired Sterling Bank in Houston, Texas.
Total assets: $44,003,000
Total deposits: $39,557,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First Security Bank of Craig does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First Security Bank of Craig, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Security Bank of Craig will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-8226