Montana – Lewis and Clark – Helena
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.fsb-hln.com
Montana
Lewis and Clark
Helena
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
20162
1970
FDIC Certificate Number: 20162
FDIC's unique number: 13855
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Billings
Federal Reserve ID Number: 647955
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 1
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1970-04-13 Institution established. Original name: First Security Bank Of Helena.
1993-11-25 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Reserve Board to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
Total assets: $43,266,000
Total deposits: $37,725,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $37,725,000
Equity capital: $4,811,000
Net income: $208,000
Return on Assets: 0.97
Return on Equity: 8.85
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: F.S.b. Holding Company
No associations
LandOfFree
First Security Bank of Helena does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First Security Bank of Helena, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Security Bank of Helena will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-15263