Kentucky – Boone – Florence
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.fstb.com
Kentucky
Boone
Florence
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
34863
1999
FDIC Certificate Number: 34863
FDIC's unique number: 61925
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Lexington
Federal Reserve ID Number: 2817323
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 3
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2010-09-16
1999-06-14 Institution established. Original name: First Security Trust Bank, Fsb.
1999-06-14 Changed trust powers to Limited Trust Powers Granted.
2004-06-30 Changed name to First Security Trust Bank, Inc. .
2004-06-30 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2004-06-30 Changed organization type to Commercial Bank.
2004-06-30 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Not Members Of The Frs.
Total assets: $121,762,000
Total deposits: $102,716,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $102,716,000
Equity capital: $11,869,000
Net income: $31,000
Return on Assets: 0.05
Return on Equity: 0.54
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Commonwealth Bancshares, Inc.
First Security Trust Bank, Inc. - Crescent Springs Branch
First Security Trust Bank, Inc. - Edgewood Branch
First Security Trust Bank, Inc. - First Security Trust Bank, Inc
No associations
LandOfFree
First Security Trust Bank, Inc. does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First Security Trust Bank, Inc., we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Security Trust Bank, Inc. will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-16566