New Hampshire – Rockingham – Portsmouth
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
www.firstsignature.com
New Hampshire
Rockingham
Portsmouth
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
26479
1985
FDIC Certificate Number: 26479
FDIC's unique number: 33145
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 204808
Report Date: 2005-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2006-02-14
1985-12-19 Institution established. Original name: First Signature Bank And Trust Company.
1985-12-19 Changed trust powers to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1986-11-07 Moved bank headquarters from North Hampton, New Hampshire to Portsmouth, New Hampshire.
2006-01-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Republic Bank in Las Vegas, Nevada.
2006-10-13 Acquired Bank Of Walnut Creek in Walnut Creek, California.
2007-09-21 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Merrill Lynch Bank & Trust Co., FSB in New York, New York.
2009-01-16 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2009-11-02 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of America, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
Total assets: $424,906,000
Total deposits: $376,219,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First Signature Bank and Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First Signature Bank and Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Signature Bank and Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-23360