Kentucky – Pulaski – Somerset
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Kentucky
Pulaski
Somerset
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
2697
1883
FDIC Certificate Number: 2697
FDIC's unique number: 1742
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Lexington
Federal Reserve ID Number: 475710
Report Date: 1998-09-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 2917
The date of the last data update: 1999-01-06
1883-03-03 Institution established. Original name: The National Bank Of Hustonville.
1991-11-18 Changed name to First Southern National Bank Of Lincoln County .
1997-01-01 Changed name to First Southern National Bank .
1997-01-17 Moved bank headquarters from Hustonville, Kentucky to Somerset, Kentucky.
1998-12-17 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Southern National in Stanford, Kentucky.
1998-12-18 Moved bank headquarters from Somerset, Kentucky to Lancaster, Kentucky.
2005-07-01 Acquired Citizens State Bank Of Ballard County in Wickliffe, Kentucky.
2005-07-01 Acquired First Bank And Trust Co. Of Princeton, Kentucky in Princeton, Kentucky.
2005-07-01 Acquired The Citizens National Bank Of Russellville in Russellville, Kentucky.
2011-04-15 Changed name to First Southern National Bank .
Total assets: $143,737,000
Total deposits: $129,269,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First Southern National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First Southern National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Southern National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-24314