South Dakota – Douglas – Armour
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.fsbadgt.com
South Dakota
Douglas
Armour
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
3983
1906
FDIC Certificate Number: 3983
FDIC's unique number: 2588
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Sioux Falls
Federal Reserve ID Number: 273251
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 4
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2010-06-01
1906-01-01 Institution established. Original name: First State Bank.
1986-09-05 Acquired Dakota State Bank, Of Tripp, South Dakota in Tripp, South Dakota.
Total assets: $93,242,000
Total deposits: $85,422,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $85,422,000
Equity capital: $7,232,000
Net income: $551,000
Return on Assets: 1.19
Return on Equity: 15.7
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Lewis Banshares, Inc.
First State Bank - Delmont Branch
First State Bank - First State Bank
First State Bank - Geddes Branch
First State Bank - Tripp Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
First State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-25738