North Dakota – Traill – Buxton
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.firststatebanks.com
North Dakota
Traill
Buxton
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
15539
1885
FDIC Certificate Number: 15539
FDIC's unique number: 9834
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Grand Forks
Federal Reserve ID Number: 917050
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 3
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1885-01-01 Institution established. Original name: First State Bank Of Buxton.
1985-07-30 Changed name to First State Bank .
Total assets: $139,509,000
Total deposits: $104,025,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $104,025,000
Equity capital: $14,276,000
Net income: $884,000
Return on Assets: 1.27
Return on Equity: 12.68
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Full Service Insurance Agency, Inc.
First State Bank - First State Bank
First State Bank - Grand Forks Branch
First State Bank - Paying And Receiving Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
First State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-2883