Oklahoma – Canadian – Yukon
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
Oklahoma
Canadian
Yukon
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
15694
1939
FDIC Certificate Number: 15694
FDIC's unique number: 9962
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Oklahoma City
Federal Reserve ID Number: 947150
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 1
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-07-10
1939-04-01 Institution established. Original name: First State Bank.
2001-02-16 Moved bank headquarters from Covington, Oklahoma to Waukomis, Oklahoma.
2006-05-26 Moved bank headquarters from Waukomis, Oklahoma to Yukon, Oklahoma.
Total assets: $17,138,000
Total deposits: $15,508,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $15,508,000
Equity capital: $1,611,000
Net income: $109,000
Return on Assets: 1.32
Return on Equity: 14.34
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Waukomis Bancshares, Inc.
No associations
LandOfFree
First State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-8034