Texas – Rains – Point
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Texas
Rains
Point
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
17554
1909
FDIC Certificate Number: 17554
FDIC's unique number: 11528
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Dallas
Federal Reserve ID Number: 852665
Report Date: 1990-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1991-04-09
1909-02-12 Institution established. Original name: First State Bank.
1991-01-25 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Colonial Bank of Greenville in Greenville, Texas.
1996-02-05 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Sulphur Springs State Bank in Sulphur Springs, Texas.
1996-10-15 Changed name to Alliance Bank .
Total assets: $11,100,000
Total deposits: $11,263,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-9264