Texas – Henderson – Eustace
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Texas
Henderson
Eustace
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
13666
1910
FDIC Certificate Number: 13666
FDIC's unique number: 8542
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Dallas
Federal Reserve ID Number: 436654
Report Date: 1990-03-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1910-01-01 Institution established. Original name: First State Bank.
1990-06-08 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The First National Bank of Athens in Athens, Texas.
1992-09-30 Acquired First National Bank Of Gun Barrel City in Gun Barrel City, Texas.
2005-05-09 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Franklin Bank, S.S.B. in Houston, Texas.
2005-06-23 Moved bank headquarters from Athens, Texas to Houston, Texas.
2005-07-15 Acquired Elgin Bank Of Texas in Elgin, Texas.
2007-05-08 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
2007-05-08 Acquired The First National Bank Of Bryan in Bryan, Texas.
2008-11-07 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Prosperity Bank in El Campo, Texas.
2008-11-07 FDIC closing information for
Franklin Bank, S.S.B. : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/franklinbank.html.
Total assets: $10,380,000
Total deposits: $9,821,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-10431