Minnesota – Benton – Gilman
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Minnesota
Benton
Gilman
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
13554
1916
FDIC Certificate Number: 13554
FDIC's unique number: 8475
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Minneapolis
Federal Reserve ID Number: 18658
Report Date: 1993-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1993-07-15
1916-05-03 Institution established. Original name: First State Bank Of Gilman, Incorporated.
1993-07-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Rural American Bank-Foley/Gilman in Foley, Minnesota.
2003-02-01 Changed name to Rural American Bank - Foley .
2006-03-04 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Frandsen Bank & Trust in Lonsdale, Minnesota.
2008-08-18 Acquired First National Bank Of Montgomery in Montgomery, Minnesota.
2009-10-19 Acquired Community Bank Of The Red River Valley in East Grand Forks, Minnesota.
2009-10-19 Acquired Northern National Bank in Nisswa, Minnesota.
2010-05-17 Acquired Valley Bank in Waterville, Minnesota.
2011-03-21 Acquired Rural American Bank - Braham in Braham, Minnesota.
2011-03-21 Acquired Rural American Bank - Luck in Luck, Wisconsin.
2011-08-22 Acquired Queen City Federal Savings Bank in Virginia, Minnesota.
Total assets: $16,834,000
Total deposits: $15,049,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First State Bank of Gilman, Incorporated does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First State Bank of Gilman, Incorporated, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First State Bank of Gilman, Incorporated will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-6717