Oklahoma – Alfalfa – Goltry
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Oklahoma
Alfalfa
Goltry
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
8982
1902
FDIC Certificate Number: 8982
FDIC's unique number: 5738
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Oklahoma City
Federal Reserve ID Number: 189455
Report Date: 1993-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1994-03-30
1902-01-01 Institution established. Original name: First State Bank Of Goltry.
1994-03-21 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Bank of Kremlin in Kremlin, Oklahoma.
1998-11-09 Acquired Bank Of Drummond in Drummond, Oklahoma.
1999-05-28 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
Total assets: $8,708,000
Total deposits: $7,596,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First State Bank of Goltry does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First State Bank of Goltry, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First State Bank of Goltry will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-16019