Texas – Falls – Marlin
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Texas
Falls
Marlin
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
8445
1909
FDIC Certificate Number: 8445
FDIC's unique number: 5376
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Dallas
Federal Reserve ID Number: 487759
Report Date: 1992-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1993-01-12
1909-09-01 Institution established. Original name: First State Bank Of Marlin.
1993-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Citizens State Bank in Woodville, Texas.
Total assets: $33,289,000
Total deposits: $33,035,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First State Bank of Marlin does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First State Bank of Marlin, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First State Bank of Marlin will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-19076