Missouri – Barry – Purdy
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.fsb-purdy.com
Missouri
Barry
Purdy
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
16162
1944
FDIC Certificate Number: 16162
FDIC's unique number: 10372
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Springfield Mo
Federal Reserve ID Number: 400057
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 5
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1944-06-19 Institution established. Original name: First State Bank Of Purdy.
1987-12-01 Acquired Citizen's National Bank Of Monett/pierce City, Mo. in Monett, Missouri.
Total assets: $129,334,000
Total deposits: $113,663,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $113,663,000
Equity capital: $11,764,000
Net income: $83,000
Return on Assets: 0.12
Return on Equity: 1.43
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Purdy Bancshares, Inc.
First State Bank Of Purdy - Cassville Branch
First State Bank Of Purdy - First State Bank Of Purdy
First State Bank Of Purdy - Monett Facility
First State Bank Of Purdy - Monett Wal-Mart Branch
First State Bank Of Purdy - Pierce City Facility
No associations
LandOfFree
First State Bank of Purdy does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First State Bank of Purdy, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First State Bank of Purdy will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-21805