Missouri – Pulaski – Saint Robert
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
active
www.firststatebankmo.com
Missouri
Pulaski
Saint Robert
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
active
19191
1964
FDIC Certificate Number: 19191
FDIC's unique number: 13011
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Springfield Mo
Federal Reserve ID Number: 277558
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SM
Number of Domestic Offices: 3
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1964-08-15 Institution established. Original name: First National Bank.
1985-09-13 Changed name to First State Bank Of St. Robert .
2002-06-30 Moved bank headquarters from St. Robert, Missouri to Saint Robert, Missouri.
Total assets: $94,934,000
Total deposits: $84,602,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $84,602,000
Equity capital: $9,018,000
Net income: $391,000
Return on Assets: 0.84
Return on Equity: 8.97
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Maries County Bancorp., Inc.
First State Bank Of St. Robert - First State Bank Of St. Robert
First State Bank Of St. Robert - Iberia Branch
First State Bank Of St. Robert - Richland Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
First State Bank of St. Robert does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First State Bank of St. Robert, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First State Bank of St. Robert will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-14990