Vermont – Windsor – White River Junction
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Vermont
Windsor
White River Junction
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
14171
1911
FDIC Certificate Number: 14171
FDIC's unique number: 8847
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Springfield Ma
Federal Reserve ID Number: 467809
Report Date: 1991-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1992-08-20
1911-01-27 Institution established. Original name: Inter-state Trust Company.
1978-01-01 Acquired The First National Bank Of White River Junction in White River Junction, Vermont.
1978-01-01 Changed name to First Inter-state Bank .
1983-06-16 Changed name to First Twin-state Bank .
1991-08-08 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Proctor Bank in Rutland, Vermont.
1991-10-25 Changed name to Green Mountain Bank .
1996-12-31 Changed trust powers from Full Trust Powers Granted to Trust Powers Terminated.
1997-07-18 Was not FDIC insured when it closed and liquidated its assets.
Total assets: $96,820,000
Total deposits: $86,703,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First Twin-State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First Twin-State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Twin-State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-25439