California – Santa Barbara – Lompoc
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
California
Santa Barbara
Lompoc
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
21024
1973
FDIC Certificate Number: 21024
FDIC's unique number: 14526
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Los Angeles (West)
Federal Reserve ID Number: 778765
Report Date: 1997-03-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1997-05-06
1973-04-04 Institution established. Original name: First Valley Bank Of Lompoc.
1978-07-15 Changed name to First Valley Bank .
1997-04-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Santa Barbara Bank & Trust in Santa Barbara, California.
1997-10-01 Acquired Citizens State Bank Of Santa Paula in Santa Paula, California.
2001-06-01 Acquired Los Robles Bank in Thousand Oaks, California.
2002-03-29 Changed name to Pacific Capital Bank, National Association .
2002-03-29 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Bank, National, Member Frs.
2002-03-29 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Reserve Board to Comptroller Of The Currency.
2002-03-29 Acquired First National Bank Of Central California in Salinas, California.
2002-03-29 Reorganized.
2004-03-05 Acquired Pacific Crest Bank in Agoura Hills, California.
2005-08-01 Acquired First Bank Of San Luis Obispo in San Luis Obispo, California.
2011-05-26 Changed name to Santa Barbara Bank & Trust, National Association .
Total assets: $123,045,000
Total deposits: $107,838,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
First Valley Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with First Valley Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and First Valley Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-27259