Colorado – Douglas – Littleton
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Colorado
Douglas
Littleton
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
26295
1985
FDIC Certificate Number: 26295
FDIC's unique number: 32702
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Denver
Federal Reserve ID Number: 297453
Report Date: 2010-09-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2010-10-25
1985-06-24 Institution established. Original name: Firstbank At Broadway/county Line Road, National Association.
1986-01-24 Changed name to Firstbank Of Littleton, National Association .
1998-03-30 Changed name to Firstbank Of Littleton .
1998-03-30 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2010-10-16 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of FirstBank in Lakewood, Colorado.
2010-10-18 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.
2010-10-18 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
2011-05-21 Acquired Firstbank Of Arizona, Inc. in Phoenix, Arizona.
Total assets: $476,755,000
Total deposits: $433,411,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
FirstBank of Littleton does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with FirstBank of Littleton, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and FirstBank of Littleton will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-14335