Colorado – Boulder – Longmont
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Colorado
Boulder
Longmont
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
20737
1972
FDIC Certificate Number: 20737
FDIC's unique number: 14322
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Denver
Federal Reserve ID Number: 87654
Report Date: 1993-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 15987
The date of the last data update: 1993-09-21
1972-06-29 Institution established. Original name: Westland National Bank.
1978-02-24 Changed name to Firstbank Of North Longmont, National Association .
1991-12-09 Acquired Firstbank Of South Longmont, National Association in Longmont, Colorado.
1991-12-09 Changed name to Firstbank Of Longmont, National Association .
1993-08-23 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of FirstBank of Longmont in Longmont, Colorado.
2010-10-16 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of FirstBank in Lakewood, Colorado.
2010-10-18 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.
2010-10-18 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
2011-05-21 Acquired Firstbank Of Arizona, Inc. in Phoenix, Arizona.
Total assets: $99,988,000
Total deposits: $87,098,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
FirstBank of Longmont, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with FirstBank of Longmont, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and FirstBank of Longmont, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-13860