Colorado – Boulder – Boulder
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Colorado
Boulder
Boulder
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
32704
1989
FDIC Certificate Number: 32704
FDIC's unique number: 45539
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Denver
Federal Reserve ID Number: 1419186
Report Date: 1994-09-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 21938
The date of the last data update: 1995-01-04
1989-11-06 Institution established. Original name: Firstbank Of South Boulder, National Association.
1994-12-19 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of FirstBank of Boulder, National Association in Boulder, Colorado.
1998-03-30 Changed name to Firstbank Of Boulder .
1998-03-30 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2010-10-16 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of FirstBank in Lakewood, Colorado.
2010-10-18 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.
2010-10-18 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
2011-05-21 Acquired Firstbank Of Arizona, Inc. in Phoenix, Arizona.
Total assets: $33,399,000
Total deposits: $30,297,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
FirstBank of South Boulder, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with FirstBank of South Boulder, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and FirstBank of South Boulder, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-14494