California – Placer – Rocklin
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.fivestarbank.com
California
Placer
Rocklin
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
35361
1999
FDIC Certificate Number: 35361
FDIC's unique number: 78823
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Sacramento
Federal Reserve ID Number: 2867337
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 4
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1999-12-20 Institution established. Original name: Five Star Bank.
2005-01-01 Acquired Five Star Bank Natomas in Sacramento, California.
Total assets: $443,440,000
Total deposits: $394,767,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $394,767,000
Equity capital: $47,477,000
Net income: $3,413,000
Return on Assets: 1.59
Return on Equity: 14.91
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Five Star Bancorp
Five Star Bank - Elk Grove Branch
Five Star Bank - Five Star Bank
Five Star Bank - Five Star Bank Natomas Branch
Five Star Bank - Rancho Cordova Branch
Five Star Bank - Redding Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Five Star Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Five Star Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Five Star Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-11728