Montana – Flathead – Kalispell
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.flatheadbank.com
Montana
Flathead
Kalispell
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
20382
1971
FDIC Certificate Number: 20382
FDIC's unique number: 14042
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Billings
Federal Reserve ID Number: 811756
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 7
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2010-09-22
1971-03-15 Institution established. Original name: Flathead Bank Of Bigfork, Montana.
2003-01-01 Acquired Valley Bank Of Belgrade in Belgrade, Montana.
2010-08-18 Moved bank headquarters from Bigfork, Montana to Kalispell, Montana.
Total assets: $204,505,000
Total deposits: $157,666,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $157,666,000
Equity capital: $29,552,000
Net income: $55,000
Return on Assets: 0.05
Return on Equity: 0.38
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Flathead Holding Company Of Bigfork
Flathead Bank Of Bigfork, Montana - Cut Bank Branch
Flathead Bank Of Bigfork, Montana - Ennis Branch
Flathead Bank Of Bigfork, Montana - Flathead Bank Of Bigfork, Mo
Flathead Bank Of Bigfork, Montana - Hutton Ranch Branch
Flathead Bank Of Bigfork, Montana - Lakeside Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Flathead Bank of Bigfork, Montana does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Flathead Bank of Bigfork, Montana, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Flathead Bank of Bigfork, Montana will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-5398