FNB Salem Bank and Trust, National Association

Virginia – Salem (city) – Salem

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

Bank class

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

Status

inactive

FDIC number

22665

Established

1978

Other info

FDIC Certificate Number: 22665
FDIC's unique number: 15818
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Richmond

Federal Reserve ID Number: 95725
Report Date: 2006-03-31

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 21516
The date of the last data update: 2006-06-01

History

1978-06-12 Institution established. Original name: Salem Bank & Trust.
1988-01-01 Changed name to Salem Bank And Trust, National Association .
2002-05-06 Acquired Fnb-southwest, National Association in Roanoke, Virginia.
2002-05-06 Changed name to Fnb Salem Bank And Trust, National Association .
2006-05-19 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First National Bank in Christiansburg, Virginia.
2008-05-24 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of StellarOne Bank in Christiansburg, Virginia.

Financial data

Total assets: $400,268,000
Total deposits: $320,877,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

FNB Salem Bank and Trust, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with FNB Salem Bank and Trust, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and FNB Salem Bank and Trust, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-10241

  Search
All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.