Iowa – Winnebago – Forest City
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
Iowa
Winnebago
Forest City
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
15745
1895
FDIC Certificate Number: 15745
FDIC's unique number: 9998
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Mankato
Federal Reserve ID Number: 620042
Report Date: 1988-03-31
Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 1999-05-05
1895-07-01 Institution established. Original name: Forest City Bank & Trust Company.
1988-05-06 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Liberty Bank and Trust in Forest City, Iowa.
1991-03-19 Changed trust powers from Full Trust Powers Granted to Limited Trust Powers Granted.
1991-06-28 Acquired Liberty Bank And Trust in Thompson, Iowa.
1992-09-18 Acquired North Iowa State Bank in Belmond, Iowa.
1998-02-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Commercial Federal Bank, a Federal Savings Bank in Omaha, Nebraska.
1998-02-27 Acquired Mid-continent Federal Savings Bank in El Dorado, Kansas.
1998-05-30 Acquired Perpetual Savings Bank, Fsb in Cedar Rapids, Iowa.
1998-07-31 Acquired Amerus Bank in Des Moines, Iowa.
1998-08-14 Acquired First Federal Bank Of Colorado in Lakewood, Colorado.
1999-03-02 Acquired Midland Bank in Lee's Summit, Missouri.
2005-12-03 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of the West in San Francisco, California.
Total assets: $26,597,000
Total deposits: $26,492,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Forest City Bank & Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Forest City Bank & Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Forest City Bank & Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-13371