Kansas – Leavenworth – Easton
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Kansas
Leavenworth
Easton
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
26756
1986
FDIC Certificate Number: 26756
FDIC's unique number: 35872
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Kansas City
Federal Reserve ID Number: 827757
Report Date: 1995-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 21318
The date of the last data update: 1995-09-22
1986-08-07 Institution established. Original name: Fort National Bank.
1986-08-07 Acquired The Easton State Bank in Easton, Kansas.
1995-07-21 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First National Bank & Trust Co. of Leavenworth in Leavenworth, Kansas.
2011-06-04 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Exchange National Bank & Trust Co. in Atchison, Kansas.
Total assets: $14,733,000
Total deposits: $12,820,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Fort National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Fort National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Fort National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-1011