Maryland – Baltimore – Nottingham
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
active
www.fullertonfederal.com
Maryland
Baltimore
Nottingham
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
active
29514
1985
FDIC Certificate Number: 29514
FDIC's unique number: 42348
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Baltimore
Federal Reserve ID Number: 249779
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
OCC Charter Number: 704E3
Number of Domestic Offices: 1
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-07-21
1985-09-12 Institution established. Original name: Fullerton Permanent Loan Association.
1987-06-30 Changed name to Fullerton Federal Savings Association .
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.
2011-10-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Fairmount Bank in Baltimore, Maryland.
Total assets: $8,932,000
Total deposits: $7,750,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $7,750,000
Equity capital: $1,127,000
Net income: $-30,000
Return on Assets: -0.67
Return on Equity: -5.27
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No associations
LandOfFree
Fullerton Federal Savings Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Fullerton Federal Savings Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Fullerton Federal Savings Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-21886