Texas – Young – Graham
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Texas
Young
Graham
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
33865
1994
FDIC Certificate Number: 33865
FDIC's unique number: 48173
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Dallas
Federal Reserve ID Number: 1998775
Report Date: 2010-09-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 22643
The date of the last data update: 2011-01-04
1994-01-03 Institution established. Original name: Graham National Bank.
2010-12-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of InterBank in Oklahoma City, Oklahoma.
2011-06-14 Acquired First National Bank Of Borger in Panhandle, Texas.
Total assets: $113,344,000
Total deposits: $101,629,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Graham National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Graham National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Graham National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-18889