www.grahamsl.com
Texas
Young
Graham
(SB) Savings banks, state charter
active
29206
1934
FDIC Certificate Number: 29206
FDIC's unique number: 42040
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Dallas
Federal Reserve ID Number: 839974
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SB
Number of Domestic Offices: 3
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-07-15
1934-11-27 Institution established. Original name: Graham Savings And Loan Association.
1984-03-31 Changed organization type to Stock Savings & Loan.
1990-10-24 Changed name to Graham Savings And Loan Association, FA .
2011-07-01 Changed name to Graham Savings And Loan, SSB .
2011-07-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2011-07-01 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
2011-07-01 Changed institution class to Fdic Supervised Savings Bank.
Total assets: $133,789,000
Total deposits: $112,349,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $112,349,000
Equity capital: $12,245,000
Net income: $1,032,000
Return on Assets: 1.56
Return on Equity: 16.89
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Graham Savings And Loan, Ssb - Breckenridge Branch
Graham Savings And Loan, Ssb - Graham Savings And Loan, Ssb
Graham Savings And Loan, Ssb - Possum Kingdom Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Graham Savings and Loan, SSB does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Graham Savings and Loan, SSB, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Graham Savings and Loan, SSB will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-1469