New Hampshire – Cheshire – Keene
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
www.granitebank.com
New Hampshire
Cheshire
Keene
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
17992
1895
FDIC Certificate Number: 17992
FDIC's unique number: 11923
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 375409
Report Date: 2004-03-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2004-06-24
1895-03-28 Institution established. Original name: The Keene Savings Bank.
1986-08-17 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1988-09-12 Changed name to Granite Bank Of Keene .
1990-03-31 Acquired Granite Bank, National Association in Peterborough, New Hampshire.
1990-03-31 Changed name to Granite Bank .
1990-03-31 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1991-05-01 Changed organization type to Commercial Bank.
1991-08-02 Acquired First Northern Co-operative Bank, A Federal Savings Bank in Keene, New Hampshire as part of a government assisted transaction.
1991-11-15 Acquired Durham Trust Company in Durham, New Hampshire.
1992-09-28 Changed trust powers from Full Trust Powers Granted to Trust Powers Terminated.
1997-11-01 Acquired Primary Bank in Peterborough, New Hampshire.
2004-05-28 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Ocean National Bank in Kennebunk, Maine.
2004-10-12 Moved bank headquarters from Keene, New Hampshire to Portsmouth, New Hampshire.
2007-06-29 Changed name to Ocean Bank .
2007-06-29 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Not Members Of The Frs.
2007-06-29 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2007-11-01 Acquired Community Bank And Trust Company in Wolfeboro, New Hampshire.
2008-01-01 Changed institution class to Occ Supervised Savings Banks.
2008-01-01 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
2008-01-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Office Of Thrift Supervision.
2009-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of People's United Bank in Bridgeport, Connecticut.
2010-04-16 Acquired Butler Bank in Lowell, Massachusetts as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-11-30 Acquired Bank Of Smithtown in Smithtown, New York.
2010-11-30 Acquired Riverbank in North Andover, Massachusetts.
2011-07-01 Acquired Danversbank in Danvers, Massachusetts.
Total assets: $1,038,474,000
Total deposits: $713,603,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Granite Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Granite Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Granite Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-3655