New Hampshire – Strafford – Somersworth
(SB) Savings banks, state charter
inactive
New Hampshire
Strafford
Somersworth
(SB) Savings banks, state charter
inactive
18018
1845
FDIC Certificate Number: 18018
FDIC's unique number: 11947
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 474704
Report Date: 1983-03-31
Bank Charter Class: SB
The date of the last data update: 1995-06-08
1845-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Granite State Savings Bank.
1983-02-28 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Southeast Bank for Savings in Dover, New Hampshire.
1984-04-11 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1987-12-30 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1995-03-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First NH Bank in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1996-09-01 Changed name to Citizens Bank New Hampshire .
1996-09-01 Acquired First New Hampshire Investment Services in Manchester, New Hampshire.
2007-09-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of RBS Citizens, National Association in Providence, Rhode Island.
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Granite State Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Granite State Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Granite State Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-19919