New Hampshire – Grafton – Lincoln
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
New Hampshire
Grafton
Lincoln
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
18882
1963
FDIC Certificate Number: 18882
FDIC's unique number: 12734
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 182308
Report Date: 1981-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1963-09-12 Institution established. Original name: Granite State Trust Company.
1982-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Plymouth Guaranty Savings Bank in Plymouth, New Hampshire.
1987-01-01 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1988-07-01 Changed name to First Central Bank .
1988-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from Plymouth, New Hampshire to Laconia, New Hampshire.
1988-07-01 Acquired Laconia Peoples National Bank And Trust Company in Laconia, New Hampshire.
1988-07-01 Acquired Meredith Bank & Trust in Meredith, New Hampshire.
1990-01-05 Acquired Wolfeboro National Bank in Wolfeboro, New Hampshire.
1991-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First NH Bank in Concord, New Hampshire.
1991-03-29 Acquired City Bank And Trust in Claremont, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Acquired Nashua Trust Company in Nashua, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Acquired Bankeast in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Acquired Amoskeag Bank in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1991-10-10 Acquired Bank Meridian, National Association in Hampton, New Hampshire.
1992-05-01 Reorganized.
1992-06-01 Acquired First Nh Bank, National Association in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1992-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from Concord, New Hampshire to Manchester, New Hampshire.
1995-03-30 Acquired Southeast Bank For Savings in Dover, New Hampshire.
1996-09-01 Changed name to Citizens Bank New Hampshire .
1996-09-01 Acquired First New Hampshire Investment Services in Manchester, New Hampshire.
2007-09-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of RBS Citizens, National Association in Providence, Rhode Island.
Total assets: $6,912,000
Total deposits: $6,352,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Granite State Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Granite State Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Granite State Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-17627