Colorado – Moffat – Craig
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
Colorado
Moffat
Craig
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
33042
1990
FDIC Certificate Number: 33042
FDIC's unique number: 46272
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Denver
Federal Reserve ID Number: 917274
Report Date: 1991-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1994-08-25
1990-05-11 Institution established. Original name: Great West Federal Savings Bank.
1990-05-11 Acquired Great West Savings Bank, F.S.B. in Craig, Colorado.
1991-08-16 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of The First National Bank of Meeker in Meeker, Colorado.
1992-02-01 Changed name to First National Bank Of The Rockies .
1997-05-02 Acquired Rocky Mountain State Bank in Rangely, Colorado.
1997-05-02 Acquired Rio Blanco State Bank in Rangely, Colorado.
1999-07-01 Acquired Yampa Valley National Bank in Hayden, Colorado.
2004-01-02 Moved bank headquarters from Meeker, Colorado to Grand Junction, Colorado.
2004-01-02 Reorganized.
Total assets: $19,873,000
Total deposits: $25,336,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Great West Federal Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Great West Federal Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Great West Federal Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-16898