Colorado – Moffat – Craig
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
Colorado
Moffat
Craig
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
32576
1988
FDIC Certificate Number: 32576
FDIC's unique number: 45410
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Denver
Federal Reserve ID Number: 917274
Report Date: 1990-03-31
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1988-03-03 Institution established. Original name: Great West Savings Bank, Fsb.
1988-03-31 Acquired First Federal Savings And Loan Association in Craig, Colorado.
1989-05-31 Changed name to Great West Savings Bank, F.S.B. .
1990-05-11 Failed, went into receivership, and then became Great West Federal Savings Bank in Craig, Colorado.
1991-08-16 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of The First National Bank of Meeker in Meeker, Colorado.
1992-02-01 Changed name to First National Bank Of The Rockies .
1997-05-02 Acquired Rocky Mountain State Bank in Rangely, Colorado.
1997-05-02 Acquired Rio Blanco State Bank in Rangely, Colorado.
1999-07-01 Acquired Yampa Valley National Bank in Hayden, Colorado.
2004-01-02 Moved bank headquarters from Meeker, Colorado to Grand Junction, Colorado.
2004-01-02 Reorganized.
Total assets: $28,089,000
Total deposits: $31,038,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Great West Savings Bank, F.S.B. does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Great West Savings Bank, F.S.B., we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Great West Savings Bank, F.S.B. will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-11645