Iowa – Polk – Clive
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
www.greatwesternbank.com
Iowa
Polk
Clive
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
35516
2000
FDIC Certificate Number: 35516
FDIC's unique number: 81169
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Des Moines
Federal Reserve ID Number: 813844
Report Date: 2006-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2007-01-26
2000-01-15 Institution established. Original name: Citizens Bank.
2000-01-15 Acquired Hartford-carlisle Savings Bank in Carlisle, Iowa as part of a government assisted transaction.
2001-08-17 Moved bank headquarters from Carlisle, Iowa to Clive, Iowa.
2003-02-24 Acquired Citizens Bank Of Princeton in Princeton, Missouri.
2003-02-24 Acquired Citizens Bank in Mount Ayr, Iowa.
2003-03-31 Changed name to Great Western Bank .
2004-11-06 Acquired Security State Bank in Red Oak, Iowa.
2007-01-12 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Great Western Bank in Watertown, South Dakota.
2007-05-11 Acquired Sunstate Bank in Casa Grande, Arizona.
2009-05-29 Acquired International Bank in Greeley, Colorado.
2010-04-23 Acquired F&m; Bank-iowa Central in Marshalltown, Iowa.
2010-06-04 Acquired Tierone Bank in Lincoln, Nebraska as part of a government assisted transaction.
Total assets: $672,858,000
Total deposits: $549,811,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Great Western Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Great Western Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Great Western Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-3676