Tennessee – Weakley – Greenfield
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.greenfieldbank.com
Tennessee
Weakley
Greenfield
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
15255
1935
FDIC Certificate Number: 15255
FDIC's unique number: 9603
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Nashville
Federal Reserve ID Number: 83955
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 3
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1935-08-16 Institution established. Original name: Greenfield Banking Company.
1987-09-28 Reorganized.
Total assets: $51,169,000
Total deposits: $41,337,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $41,337,000
Equity capital: $6,051,000
Net income: $104,000
Return on Assets: 0.41
Return on Equity: 3.46
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Greenfield Bancshares, Inc.
Greenfield Banking Company - Greenfield Banking Company
Greenfield Banking Company - Greenfield Branch
Greenfield Banking Company - Greenfield Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
Greenfield Banking Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Greenfield Banking Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Greenfield Banking Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-16979