Iowa – Guthrie – Panora
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.gcsbank.com
Iowa
Guthrie
Panora
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
226
1931
FDIC Certificate Number: 226
FDIC's unique number: 179
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Des Moines
Federal Reserve ID Number: 969844
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 2
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1931-10-17 Institution established. Original name: Guthrie County State Bank.
1998-04-06 Moved bank headquarters from Guthrie Center, Iowa to Panora, Iowa.
Total assets: $105,683,000
Total deposits: $83,748,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $83,748,000
Equity capital: $9,245,000
Net income: $175,000
Return on Assets: 0.33
Return on Equity: 4.23
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Guthrie County Bancshares, Inc.
Guthrie County State Bank - Guthrie Center Branch
Guthrie County State Bank - Guthrie County State Bank
No associations
LandOfFree
Guthrie County State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Guthrie County State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Guthrie County State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-9027