Illinois – Jersey – Jerseyville
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
Illinois
Jersey
Jerseyville
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
30628
1887
FDIC Certificate Number: 30628
FDIC's unique number: 43462
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Springfield Il
Federal Reserve ID Number: 325075
Report Date: 1989-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1994-07-27
1887-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Heritage Savings And Loan.
1989-08-24 Failed, went into receivership, and then became Heritage Savings and Loan Association, F.A. in Jerseyville, Illinois.
1990-08-24 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of The Carrollton Bank and Trust Company in Carrollton, Illinois.
1994-10-25 Changed name to Carrollton Bank .
1998-11-10 Acquired Zook & Roecker State Bank in Oregon, Missouri.
Total assets: $32,884,000
Total deposits: $27,735,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Heritage Savings and Loan does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Heritage Savings and Loan, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Heritage Savings and Loan will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-6994