Illinois – Lake – Highland Park
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
Illinois
Lake
Highland Park
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
30107
1888
FDIC Certificate Number: 30107
FDIC's unique number: 42941
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Chicago
Federal Reserve ID Number: 0
Report Date: 1977-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1977-06-30
1888-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Highland Park Federal Savings And Loan Association.
1977-06-30 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Bell Federal Savings and Loan Association in Chicago, Illinois.
1991-11-01 Acquired National Security, A Federal Bank For Savings in Chicago, Illinois.
1996-06-07 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Standard Federal Bank in Troy, Michigan.
2001-10-06 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Standard Federal Bank National Association in Troy, Michigan.
2005-09-12 Changed name to Lasalle Bank Midwest National Association .
2008-10-17 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of America, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
2009-01-16 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2009-04-27 Acquired Countrywide Bank, Fsb in Centennial, Colorado.
2009-07-01 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank Usa in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2009-11-02 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank & Trust Co., Fsb in New York, New York.
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Highland Park Federal Savings and Loan Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Highland Park Federal Savings and Loan Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Highland Park Federal Savings and Loan Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-20164