Montana – Lewis and Clark – Helena
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
Montana
Lewis and Clark
Helena
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
31007
1895
FDIC Certificate Number: 31007
FDIC's unique number: 43841
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Billings
Federal Reserve ID Number: 782472
Report Date: 1983-03-31
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1998-07-17
1895-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Home Federal Savings And Loan Association.
1983-01-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Western Federal Savings and Loan Association in Missoula, Montana.
1985-10-31 Changed name to Western Federal Savings And Loan Association Of Montana .
1985-10-31 Moved bank headquarters from Helena, Montana to Missoula, Montana.
1988-12-31 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1988-12-31 Changed name to Western Federal Savings Bank Of Montana .
1988-12-31 Acquired Great Falls Federal Savings And Loan Association in Great Falls, Montana.
1989-08-31 Changed organization type to Mutual Savings Bank.
1991-08-01 Acquired First Federal Savings And Loan Association in Billings, Montana.
1994-01-06 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1997-02-28 Acquired Security Bank, Fsb in Billings, Montana.
1998-02-02 Changed name to Western Security Bank .
2001-05-17 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Western Security Bank in Billings, Montana.
2001-07-20 Moved bank headquarters from Missoula, Montana to Billings, Montana.
2007-01-27 Acquired First Citizens Bank Of Billings in Billings, Montana.
2011-04-19 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Not Members Of The Frs.
2011-04-19 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Reserve Board to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Home Federal Savings and Loan Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Home Federal Savings and Loan Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Home Federal Savings and Loan Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-16610