Iowa – Shelby – Harlan
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
Iowa
Shelby
Harlan
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
29092
1934
FDIC Certificate Number: 29092
FDIC's unique number: 41926
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Omaha
Federal Reserve ID Number: 956479
Report Date: 1991-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1991-10-11
1934-08-01 Institution established. Original name: Home Federal Savings And Loan Association Of Harlan.
1991-09-27 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Conservative Savings Bank, F.S.B. in Omaha, Nebraska.
1996-02-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Commercial Federal Bank, a Federal Savings Bank in Omaha, Nebraska.
1996-10-01 Acquired Hawkeye Federal Savings Bank in Boone, Iowa.
1997-05-01 Acquired Investors Federal Savings in Kinsley, Kansas.
1998-01-30 Acquired First United National Bank And Trust Company in Great Bend, Kansas.
1998-02-13 Acquired Liberty Bank And Trust, National Association in Pocahontas, Iowa.
1998-02-13 Acquired Liberty Bank & Trust in Lake Mills, Iowa.
1998-02-13 Acquired Liberty Bank & Trust in Mason City, Iowa.
1998-02-13 Acquired Liberty Bank & Trust in Bloomfield, Iowa.
1998-02-13 Acquired Liberty Bank & Trust in Woodbine, Iowa.
1998-02-13 Acquired Liberty Bank And Trust in Forest City, Iowa.
1998-02-13 Acquired Liberty Bank And Trust in Johnston, Iowa.
1998-02-13 Acquired Liberty Bank & Trust in Tucson, Arizona.
1998-02-27 Acquired Mid-continent Federal Savings Bank in El Dorado, Kansas.
1998-05-30 Acquired Perpetual Savings Bank, Fsb in Cedar Rapids, Iowa.
1998-07-31 Acquired Amerus Bank in Des Moines, Iowa.
1998-08-14 Acquired First Federal Bank Of Colorado in Lakewood, Colorado.
1999-03-02 Acquired Midland Bank in Lee's Summit, Missouri.
2005-12-03 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of the West in San Francisco, California.
Total assets: $91,411,000
Total deposits: $89,021,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Home Federal Savings and Loan Association of Harlan does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Home Federal Savings and Loan Association of Harlan, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Home Federal Savings and Loan Association of Harlan will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-26655