New Hampshire – Belknap – Laconia
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
New Hampshire
Belknap
Laconia
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
28946
1934
FDIC Certificate Number: 28946
FDIC's unique number: 41780
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 962872
Report Date: 1991-09-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 2000-03-28
1934-05-01 Institution established. Original name: Laconia Federal Savings And Loan Association.
1981-12-31 Acquired Gorham Savings Bank in Gorham, New Hampshire.
1985-10-31 Changed organization type to Stock Savings & Loan.
1986-05-27 Changed name to Homebank, Fsb .
1986-10-31 Acquired Home Bank Fsb in Berlin, New Hampshire.
1987-10-31 Moved bank headquarters from Laconia, New Hampshire to Berlin, New Hampshire.
1990-01-22 Moved bank headquarters from Berlin, New Hampshire to Gilford, New Hampshire.
1990-02-28 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1991-10-10 Failed, went into receivership, and then became HomeBank Federal Savings Association in Gilford, New Hampshire.
1994-07-22 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Laconia Savings Bank in Laconia, New Hampshire.
1996-05-07 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1998-07-01 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1998-07-01 Reorganized.
2005-10-01 Acquired Village Bank & Trust Company in Gilford, New Hampshire.
Total assets: $255,081,000
Total deposits: $192,059,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
HomeBank, FSB does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with HomeBank, FSB, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and HomeBank, FSB will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-11806