New Hampshire – Merrimack – Concord
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
New Hampshire
Merrimack
Concord
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
27441
1989
FDIC Certificate Number: 27441
FDIC's unique number: 39935
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 1358687
Report Date: 1995-03-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1995-04-25
1989-01-30 Institution established. Original name: Horizon Bank And Trust.
1995-04-16 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Primary Bank in Peterborough, New Hampshire.
1997-11-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Granite Bank in Keene, New Hampshire.
2004-05-28 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Ocean National Bank in Kennebunk, Maine.
2004-10-12 Moved bank headquarters from Keene, New Hampshire to Portsmouth, New Hampshire.
2007-06-29 Changed name to Ocean Bank .
2007-06-29 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Not Members Of The Frs.
2007-06-29 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2007-11-01 Acquired Community Bank And Trust Company in Wolfeboro, New Hampshire.
2008-01-01 Changed institution class to Occ Supervised Savings Banks.
2008-01-01 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
2008-01-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Office Of Thrift Supervision.
2009-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of People's United Bank in Bridgeport, Connecticut.
2010-04-16 Acquired Butler Bank in Lowell, Massachusetts as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-11-30 Acquired Bank Of Smithtown in Smithtown, New York.
2010-11-30 Acquired Riverbank in North Andover, Massachusetts.
2011-07-01 Acquired Danversbank in Danvers, Massachusetts.
Total assets: $49,881,000
Total deposits: $42,715,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Horizon Bank and Trust does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Horizon Bank and Trust, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Horizon Bank and Trust will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-4154